USA v. Mossberg 590 Shotgun et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Sig Sauer P238, Mossberg 590 Shotgun, Ruger LCR and New England Firearms SB1
Case Number: 1:2019cv00716
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Melissa Moody , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 9/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to USA, Mossberg 590 Shotgun, New England Firearms SB1, Ruger LCR, Sig Sauer P238. (bt)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Rabuck, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to Mossberg 590 Shotgun, New England Firearms SB1, Ruger LCR, Sig Sauer P238. (ej)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-716-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Defendants in rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Rabuck, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Mossberg 590 Shotgun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer P238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mossberg 590 Shotgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger LCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Firearms SB1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?