USA v. Eskel et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and USA
Defendant: Carel M. Eskel, Carol M. Eskel, Town of Danville, Bon Accord, Joseph R. Eskel and Danville, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00745
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Supplemental Certificate of Service by Danville, NH, Town of(Gannon, William)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, , COUNTERCLAIM against USA with Certificate of Service filed by Danville, NH, Town of.(Gannon, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Motion Show Cause filed by Carel M. Eskel, Joseph R. Eskel. Served on 9/5/2019 via CM/ECF. Follow up on Objection on 9/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Verified Show Cause Denial of Jurisdiction)(ko)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER/Response to #1 Complaint by Bon Accord, Carel M. Eskel, Joseph R. Eskel. (Attachments: #1 Book 6025 Page 867, #2 Book 6025 Page 0870, #3 Book 6025 Page 0873, #4 Book 6025 Page 0875, #5 Book 6025 Page 0877, #6 Book 6025 Page 0879, #7 Book 6025 Page 0917, #8 Book 6025 Page 0920, #9 Book 6025 Page 1797, #10 Book 6025 Page 1799, #11 Book 6025 Page 1801, #12 Book 6025 Page 1803, #13 Book 6025 Page 1806, #14 Book 6025 Page 1808, #15 Book 6025 Page 1810, #16 Book 6025 Page 1817)(ko)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Bon Accord by USA. Served/Mailed on 7/30/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Carel M. Eskel by USA. Served/Mailed on 7/30/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Joseph R. Eskel by USA. Served/Mailed on 7/30/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 9/7/2019. (vln)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to Sept. 7, 2019 filed by Danville, NH, Town of.(Gannon, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Carel M. Eskel, Joseph R. Eskel, Bon Accord by Carel M. Eskel, Joseph R. Eskel, Bond Accord. Served/Mailed on 7/29/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ko)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William S. Gannon on behalf of Danville, NH, Town of Attorney William S. Gannon added to party Danville, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Gannon, William)
July 28, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Danville, NH, Town of (Town Clerk) by USA. Served/Mailed on 7/18/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bednar, Philip)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Bon Accord, Danville, NH, Town of, Carel M. Eskel, Joseph R. Eskel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-745-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Joseph Eskel, #3 Summons - Waiver Carel M. Eskel, #4 Summons - Waiver Bon Accord, #5 Summons - Waiver Town of Danville (Selectmen), #6 Summons - Waiver Town of Danville (Town Clerk))(Bednar, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Eskel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carel M. Eskel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol M. Eskel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Danville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Accord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Eskel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danville, NH, Town of
Represented By: William S. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip L. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Philip L. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?