Markusic et al v. Navigators Management Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Todd Markusic and Terry Markusic
Defendant: Navigators Management Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00758
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 10/6/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 9/4/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 9/18/2020. (vln)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving in part #7 Discovery Plan. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/22/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/27/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 5/1/2020.(vln)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Terry Markusic, Todd Markusic. (Noonan, D.)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan due by 9/3/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2019-cv-00281, Strafford County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Certified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Certified Summons, #4 Exhibit Certified Return of Service)(Sears, Michele)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc..(Sears, Michele)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(js)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 31, 2019 filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. (Sears, Michele)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 31, 2019 filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc..(Sears, Michele)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Navigators Management Company, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sears, Michele)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Navigators Management Company, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by July 24, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-758-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford Superior Court, case number 219-2019-cv-00281 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1838064) filed by Navigators Management Company, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 8/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice to Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sears, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markusic et al v. Navigators Management Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Markusic
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Markusic
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michele Carlucci Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?