Union Hall Company v. Pro Guard Coatings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Union Hall Company
Defendant: Arkadiusz Sznajdrowski, Pro Guard Coatings, Inc. and Eric Sznajdrowski
Case Number: 1:2019cv00780
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 9/25/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Arkadiusz Sznajdrowski.(Shirley, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2019-cv-730, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Segment 2 - due to size restiction)(Staar, William)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/19/2019.(vln)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 19, 2019 filed by Arkadiusz Sznajdrowski.(Shirley, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Q. Shirley on behalf of Arkadiusz Sznajdrowski Attorney James Q. Shirley added to party Arkadiusz Sznajdrowski(pty:dft).(Shirley, James)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Pro Guard Coatings, Inc..(Lasna, Meredith)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Union Hall Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hedges, Katherine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Pro Guard Coatings, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lasna, Meredith)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Pro Guard Coatings, Inc.. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Union Hall Company shall file a disclosure statement by August 15, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 8/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Pro Guard Coatings, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Pro Guard Coatings, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by August 1, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
July 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-780-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham Superior, case number 218-2019-cv-730 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1840763) filed by Pro Guard Coatings, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 8/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit D - Motion to Extend Time) Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Lasna, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Hall Company v. Pro Guard Coatings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkadiusz Sznajdrowski
Represented By: James Q. Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Guard Coatings, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith M. Lasna
Represented By: William A. Staar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sznajdrowski
Represented By: James Q. Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Hall Company
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?