Steinmetz et al v. Dumais
Plaintiff: Lauran Steinmetz and James Steinmetz
Defendant: Gregory Dumais
Case Number: 1:2019cv00789
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 10/18/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Gregory Dumais. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the Filing User's name, bar registration number, address, primary telephone number, and e-mail address. The name of the Filing User under whose log-in and password the document is submitted must be preceded by a "/s/ [Insert Signatorys Name] and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (vln)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Gregory Dumais.(Walker, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James G. Walker on behalf of Gregory Dumais Attorney James G. Walker added to party Gregory Dumais(pty:dft).(Walker, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gregory Dumais by James Steinmetz, Lauran Steinmetz. Served/Mailed on 7/29/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) issued electronically as to Gregory Dumais. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons(es) and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 ECF Notice)(vln)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by James Steinmetz, Lauran Steinmetz(King, Benjamin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Gregory Dumais. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (mc)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-789-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1841625 filed by James Steinmetz, Lauran Steinmetz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Notice of Lawsuit, #3Waiver of Service)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinmetz et al v. Dumais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Dumais
Represented By: James G. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauran Steinmetz
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Steinmetz
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?