NST Global, LLC v. Sig Sauer Inc.
Plaintiff: NST Global, LLC
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00792
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 65 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Carroll, Laura)
September 25, 2019 Filing 64 JOINT PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Sig Sauer Inc..(Carroll, Laura)
September 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Mail Returned- Box Closed re #60 Notice of Patent Case Scheduling Conference.(js)
September 6, 2019 Filing 62 RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/25/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #61 Assented to Motion to Continue Patent Case Scheduling Conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
September 4, 2019 Filing 61 Assented to MOTION to Continue Patent Case Scheduling Conference filed by NST Global, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 9/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nixon, Leslie)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 Assented to Motion for Eric G. J. Kaviar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
August 13, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/6/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
August 12, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Anthony E. Faillaci on behalf of Sig Sauer Inc.(js)
August 12, 2019 Filing 58 Assented to MOTION for Eric G. J. Kaviar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1847346.) filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Eric G. J. Kaviar)(Carroll, Laura)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #57 Assented to Motion for Jason M. Ellison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Jason M. Ellison, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #52 Motion for Brittany Maxey-Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Brittany Maxey-Fisher, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #51 Motion for Samuel E. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Samuel E. Cooley, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #50 Motion for William R. Brees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that William R. Brees, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
August 9, 2019 Filing 57 Assented to MOTION for Jason M. Ellison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1846894.) filed by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Jason M. Ellison)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 56 Addendum/ to #52 MOTION for Brittany Maxey-Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1845203.) by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Brittany J. Maxey-Fisher)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 55 Addendum/ to #51 MOTION for Samuel E. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1845186.) by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Samuel E. Cooley)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 54 Addendum/ to #50 MOTION for William R. Brees to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1845183.) by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William R. Brees)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Helena C. Rychlicki on behalf of Sig Sauer Inc.(js)
August 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Documents re #50 MOTION for William R. Brees to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #51 MOTION for Samuel E. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #52 MOTION for Brittany Maxey-Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by NST Global, LLC.The documents fail to comply with LR 7.1- No statement of concurrence was included. Additionally, each affidavit does not include a /s/ signature, nor do they include a date. File concurrence statements as an addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) back to the original motion. File the corrected affidavits using the Other Documents/Affidavit event and link the filing(s) back to the the original motion. The documents will remain on file. Please note that unless documents curing the defects are filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matters may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 8/9/2019.(js)
August 6, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Brittany Maxey-Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1845203.) filed by NST Global, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Brittany J. Maxey-Fisher)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Samuel E. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1845186.) filed by NST Global, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Samuel E. Cooley)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for William R. Brees to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1845183.) filed by NST Global, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William R. Brees)(Nixon, Leslie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie C. Nixon on behalf of NST Global, LLC Attorney Leslie C. Nixon added to party NST Global, LLC(pty:pla).(Nixon, Leslie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 48 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(mc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Raeann Warner, Esq., Jason M. Ellison, Esq., Helena C. Rychlicki, Esq., Anthony E. Faillaci, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 8/30/2019. (mc)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-792-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 47 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 8/28/2019. (mc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 46 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number: 1:19-cv-00121. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
July 18, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NST GLOBAL, LLC, d/b/a SB TACTICALS INITIAL CLAIM CHARTS FOR ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by NST Global, LLC.(Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Remark: This case will be transferred to the District of New Hampshire in 10 days in accordance with Clerk's Office procedures and per the Court's memorandum opinion and order of 7/9/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/9/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/9/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason M. Ellison for NST Global, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 42 Supplemental DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SIG Sauer, Inc.'s Disclosures in Compliance with Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sig Sauer Inc..(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason M. Ellison filed by NST Global, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/6/2019. (fms) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 40 Supplemental DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition Motion to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason M. Ellison - filed by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER in response to D.I. #38 Letter, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall follow the Default Standard for Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall follow the new briefing requirements as outlined in the Court's scheduling order for patent cases as revised April 22, 2019. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/31/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 38 Joint Letter to Judge Colm F. Connolly from Raeann Warner, Esq. regarding Request for clarification in light of this Court's issuance of the new scheduling order template for patent infringement cases. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/23/2019. (fms) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Protective Order by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME deadline to submit joint form of protective order to 05-22-2019 filed by NST Global, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/17/2019. (fms) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME deadline to submit joint form of protective order to 05-22-2019 - filed by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure of Asserted Patents and Accused Products filed by NST Global, LLC.(Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of NST Global, LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Rule 26(a)(1) filed by NST Global, LLC.(Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant SIG Sauer, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Sig Sauer Inc..(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire, #30 Reply Brief by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for all disputes relating to discovery matters and protective orders. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 5/15/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/3/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 6/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/16/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 4/16/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel E. Cooley filed by NST Global, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/16/2019. (fms) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel E. Cooley - filed by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Rule 16 Scheduling Order re #14 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #26 Letter, The letter request to postpone the 4/16/2019 Scheduling Conference is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/12/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 12, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. 20 has been removed from the docket as it was the answering brief at D.I. #19 erroneously filed again under the Declaration docket event. (fms) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 Letter to Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Helena C. Rychlicki regarding 4/16/19 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - re Oral Order, Set Hearings. (Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Request For Judicial Notice)(Warner, Raeann) Modified on 4/11/2019 (fms). [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to William Brees' Declaration)(Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #19 Answering Brief in Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire filed by NST Global, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2019. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Rescheduling Hearings, Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, The Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 4/16/2019 at 03:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/10/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #16 Opening Brief in Support, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through L to Declaration of Laura L. Carroll)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #16 Opening Brief in Support, #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B to Declaration of John Brasseur)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire filed by Sig Sauer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/10/2019. (Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case to New Hampshire - filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no issues to discuss at the scheduling conference other than dates, they may request a telephonic scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/13/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Brees filed by NST Global, LLC, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittay J. Maxey-Fisher filed by NST Global, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/27/2019. (fms) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William R. Brees - filed by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brittay J. Maxey-Fisher - filed by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura L. Carroll, Eric G.J. Kaviar, and Anthony E. Faillaci for Sig Sauer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric G. J. Kaviar filed by Sig Sauer Inc., #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony E. Faillaci filed by Sig Sauer Inc., #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura L. Carroll filed by Sig Sauer Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Anthony E. Faillaci - filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric G. J. Kaviar - filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura L. Carroll - filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent SIG SAUER US Holding LP, Other Affiliate L&O Finance GmbH, Other Affiliate SIG SAUER Management LLC for Sig Sauer Inc. filed by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sig Sauer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Helena C. Rychlicki on behalf of Sig Sauer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rychlicki, Helena) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 73.1 Consent, and Report to Commissioner on Filing of an Action served on Sig Sauer Inc. on 1/23/19, filed by NST Global, LLC. (Warner, Raeann) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sig Sauer Inc. on 1/22/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,869,444 B2 and US 9,354,021 B2. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Sig Sauer Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2549501.) - filed by NST Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) [Transferred from ded on 7/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NST Global, LLC v. Sig Sauer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc.
Represented By: Anthony E. Faillaci
Represented By: Laura L. Carroll
Represented By: Eric G.J. Kaviar
Represented By: Helena C. Rychlicki
Represented By: Eric G. J. Kaviar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NST Global, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: Raeann Warner
Represented By: Samuel E. Cooley
Represented By: Brittany J. Maxey Fisher
Represented By: William R. Brees
Represented By: Leslie C. Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?