Salform Inc. v. Anvil International, LLC
Plaintiff: Salform Inc.
Defendant: Anvil International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00796
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Anvil International, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Cowan, Peter)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/15/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Salform Inc. with jury demand filed by Anvil International, LLC.(Cowan, Peter)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 09/17/19. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 9/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 09/17/19 filed by Anvil International, LLC.(Cowan, Peter)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter S. Cowan on behalf of Anvil International, LLC Attorney Peter S. Cowan added to party Anvil International, LLC(pty:dft).(Cowan, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons as to Anvil International, LLC filed by Salform Inc.. Served/Mailed on 8/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Butler, Gerard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Salform Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Butler, Gerard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Anvil International, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
July 30, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-796-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1842486 filed by Salform Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quote 10850, #2 Exhibit Quote 10854, #3 Exhibit Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit Acknowledgment, #5 Exhibit Salamon Invoice, #6 Exhibit Check Receipt, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butler, Gerard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #8 Summons) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salform Inc. v. Anvil International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anvil International, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salform Inc.
Represented By: Gerard A. Butler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?