NH, State of v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: NH, State of
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., The Chemours Company, L.L.C., Chemguard, Inc. and E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00800
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #15 Assented to MOTION for Jonathan I. Handler to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Jonathan I. Handler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1856485.) filed by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Sackman, Edward)
August 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ko)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MDL FINAL ORDER: Case is transferred to United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. MDL No. 2873. (ko)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER MDL No. 2 re: conditional transfer to United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. Stay is lifted as no objection to the transfer was filed with the Panel. 2873. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/11/2019. (ko)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sackman, Edward)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J. Sackman on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. Attorney Edward J. Sackman added to party Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sackman, Edward)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NH, State of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. 3M Service Documents, #2 Exhibit B. DuPont Service Documents, #3 Exhibit C. Chemours Service to Reg Agent, #4 Exhibit D. Buckeye Service Documents, #5 Exhibit E. Buckeye Service Documents, #6 Exhibit F. Chemguard Service Documents, #7 Exhibit G. Chemguard Service Documents, #8 Exhibit H. Chemours Service Documents, #9 Exhibit I. Chemours Service Documents, #10 Exhibit J. Kidde Fenwal Service Documents, #11 Exhibit K. Kidde Fenwal Service Documents, #12 Exhibit L. National Foam Service Documents, #13 Exhibit M. National Foam Service Documents, #14 Exhibit N. Tyco Service Documents, #15 Exhibit O. Tyco Service Documents)(Head, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Until the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this case to the pending AFFF Multidistrict Litigation in the USDC for the District of South Carolina. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to Until the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this case to the pending AFFF Multidistrict Litigation in the USDC for the District of South Carolina filed by 3M Company.(Rouvalis, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-00446, Hillsborough County North County Superior Court(Rouvalis, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. Foster on behalf of 3M Company Attorney Joseph A. Foster added to party 3M Company(pty:dft).(Foster, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by 3M Company disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Rouvalis, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER MDL No. 1 (CTO-17) re: Conditional transfer to United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. Order is not effective until filed in the transferee court. 2873. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/3/2019. (ko)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard W Head on behalf of NH, State of Attorney Richard W Head added to party NH, State of(pty:pla).(Head, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the Notice of Removal sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal) (ej)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher G Aslin(NHAG) on behalf of NH, State of Attorney Christopher G Aslin(NHAG) added to party NH, State of(pty:pla).(Aslin(NHAG), Christopher)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by 3M Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. 3M Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, LLC., Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., and National Foam, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by August 8, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Ellen Nunno Corbo Esq., Keith E. Smith, Esq., Jonathan I. Handler, Esq., Joseph G. Petrosinelli, Esq., and Liam J. Montgomery, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 9/3/2019. (ej)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-800-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court, case number 216-2019-CV-00446 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1842973) filed by 3M Company. Answer Follow Up on 8/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - September 2017 MilSpec, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Notice of Removal to Counsel, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. 5 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Rouvalis, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #6 CORRECTED Notice of Removal with Signature) (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NH, State of v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Represented By: Joseph A. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Liam J. Montgomery
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan I. Handler
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Liam J. Montgomery
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NH, State of
Represented By: Kelvin A. Brooks
Represented By: Richard W Head
Represented By: Christopher G Aslin(NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?