Pratt v. Kingston, NH, Town of et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Pratt
Defendant: Fred Smith and Kingston, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00834
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Addendum/Appendix Part 2 to Memo of Law to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Kingston, NH, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 3 to Memo of Law)(Dietel, Robert) Modified on 10/10/2019 to add: appendix text (lw).
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kingston, NH, Town of. Follow up on Objection on 10/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Part 1 to Memo of Law)(Dietel, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Pursuant to the referral of August 13, 2019, the court has plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief under advisement. The docket indicates that the defendants have been served. The defendants shall file their responses to the plaintiff's request for injunctive relief on or before October 11, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (Response deadline set for 10/11/2019)(lw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #9 MOTION to Strike and incorporated memo of law filed by Fred Smith. Follow up on Reply on 9/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Bucksbaum, Erin)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Defendant Fred Smith's Affirmative Defenses filed by Nancy Pratt. Served on 9/16/2019. Follow up on Objection on 10/1/2019. (lw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with jury demand filed by Fred Smith.(Bucksbaum, Erin)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Errors re: #7 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Fred Smith. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Johnson on behalf of Fred Smith Attorney Michael P. Johnson added to party Fred Smith(pty:dft).(Johnson, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Shane Bucksbaum on behalf of Fred Smith Attorney Erin Shane Bucksbaum added to party Fred Smith(pty:dft).(Bucksbaum, Erin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 10/10/2019. (lw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 10, 2019 filed by Kingston, NH, Town of.(Dietel, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Joseph Dietel on behalf of Kingston, NH, Town of Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Kingston, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Dietel, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Returns of Service Executed as to Kingston, NH, Town of, Fred Smith by Nancy Pratt. Served/Mailed on 8/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/10/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(lw)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Plaintiff has requested preliminary injunctive relief (doc. no. 1). The magistrate judge is designated to consider the request and, if necessary, conduct a hearing on the matter. The magistrate judge shall file proposed findings and recommendations with the court. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Kingston, NH, Town of, Fred Smith. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
August 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-834-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingston, NH, Town of, Fred Smith (Filing fee $400 receipt number 14649018172) filed by Nancy Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Summonses, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Kingston, NH, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Smith
Represented By: Erin Shane Bucksbaum
Represented By: Michael P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston, NH, Town of
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?