Beaubrun v. US Attorney General et al
Petitioner: Jeff Benson Beaubrun
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director and US Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00835
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (cmp)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Joint Assented to Motion to Vacate #4 Order on Motion to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Assented to MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Jeff Benson Beaubrun.(Kim, SangYeob)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Without Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Jeff Benson Beaubrun(Kim, SangYeob)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Attorney General (vln)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case, filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Attorney General, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary. Attorney T. David Plourde added to party Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director(pty:res), Attorney T. David Plourde added to party US Attorney General(pty:res), Attorney T. David Plourde added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary(pty:res). (Plourde, T.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Respondent Strafford County's ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to Order of August 13, 2019 (Date Served August 13, 2019) (Per Local Rule 7.4 statement or motion to be filed within sixty days.) by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent.Compliance Deadline set for 10/25/2019.(Velardi, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B York on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, US Attorney General, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary Attorney Thomas B York added to party Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director(pty:res), Attorney Thomas B York added to party Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent(pty:res), Attorney Thomas B York added to party US Attorney General(pty:res), Attorney Thomas B York added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary(pty:res).(York, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 US Marshal Service of Process served on 8/22/19, on Strafford County Superintendent's Office.(cmp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of The BIA's Stay Order by Jeff Benson Beaubrun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_BIA Stay Order)(Kim, SangYeob)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Addendum/ to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case, Exhibit 7_Expert Affidavit in support of Habeas Corpus Petition and Application for Asylum, Withholding of Removal, and Protection under the Convention Against Torture by Jeff Benson Beaubrun. (Kim, SangYeob)
August 13, 2019 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies hand delivered to Chief, Civil Division, U.S. Attorney's Office; copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director, US Attorney General, US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary and copies to US Marshal for Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, per #5 Order Directing Service.(jb)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. The clerk to make delivery of the Petition and this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire. Clerk to send certified copies as outlined to ICE Boston Field Office, the Acting Secretary of Homeland Security in Washington, D.C. and the United States Attorney General. Service upon Strafford County Department of Corrections to be effected by U.S. Marshals Service. Respondents shall file an answer or other response within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Respondents shall provide the court with at least 48 hours advance notice of any scheduled removal or transfer of petitioner out of this court's jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to immediately provide a copy of this order to the District of NH United States Attorney's Office Civil Bureau Chief. Any party may request a telephone conference as outlined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Emergency Motion to Stay Petitioner's Transfer to Louisiana and Removal. Respondents enjoined and prohibited from removing or transferring petitioner as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/12/2019. (Pltfs Atty: Gilles R. Bissonnette, SangYeob Kim, Henry Klementowicz) (Defts Atty: T. David Plourde)(Total Hearing Time: 22 minutes) (jb)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 04:20 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The court will initiate the call.(jb)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-835-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Jeff Benson Beaubrun Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Jeff Benson Beaubrun(pty:pet).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to Stay Petitioner's Transfer to Louisiana and Removal filed by Jeff B Beaubrun. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kim, SangYeob)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1847463.) filed by Jeff B Beaubrun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1_Petitioner's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2_Removal Order, #3 Exhibit 3_NTA, #4 Exhibit 4_Political Membership Card, #5 Exhibit 5_Fear Interview Refusal, #6 Exhibit 6_MTR IJ Denial, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, SangYeob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaubrun v. US Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Benson Beaubrun
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Represented By: Thomas B York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Represented By: Thomas P. Velardi
Represented By: Thomas B York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Represented By: Thomas B York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Represented By: Thomas B York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?