Murphy v. Gold's Gym et al
Plaintiff: Gary Murphy
Defendant: Fitlab Fitness Club, Dow Fitness, Inc., On Target Management, Inc and Gold's Gym
Case Number: 1:2019cv00841
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Dow Fitness, Inc., On Target Management, Inc.(Cullen, Brian)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Gary Murphy. Served/Mailed on 8/13/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meyer, H.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Dow Fitness, Inc., Fitlab Fitness Club, Gold's Gym, On Target Management, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-841-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1848076 filed by Gary Murphy.(Meyer, H.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #1 Waivers, #3 PDF Text Searchable Complaint) (mc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #4 Notice of Lawsuits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mc). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/15/2019) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Gold's Gym et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitlab Fitness Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Target Management, Inc
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold's Gym
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Murphy
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?