McElroy v. TRT Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grace McElroy
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation, David Ikasalo, Omni Mount Washington, LLC and TRT Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00844
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 10/1/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/3/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. (ko)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving #8 Discovery Plan with changes. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/29/2019. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 5/1/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 6/1/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/1/2020. (ko)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by David Ikasalo, Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Eli Jason S. Mackey added to party David Ikasalo(pty:dft), Attorney Eli Jason S. Mackey added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Eli Jason S. Mackey added to party Omni Mount Washington, LLC(pty:dft).(Mackey, Eli Jason)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2019-CV-00229, Grafton County County Superior Court(Gamache, Heather)
September 10, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No State Court Record Filed. The defendants are directed to file the record within 14 days of this notice. Mediation Follow Up on 9/24/2019.(ko)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants by Grace McElroy. Served/Mailed on 8/26/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kenison, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to MOTION for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that C. STEPHEN SETLIFF submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/13/2019. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(ko)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(ko)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Assented to MOTION for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice , filed by TRT Holdings, Inc., and #4 Assented to MOTION for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by TRT Holdings, Inc.. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (vln)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1857072.) filed by TRT Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of C. Stephen Setliff, Esq.)(Gamache, Heather)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1857061.) filed by TRT Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Eli Jason S. Mackey, Esq.)(Gamache, Heather)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/18/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Holdings, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Gamache, Heather)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by David Ikasalo, Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Holdings, Inc..(Gamache, Heather)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Omni Mount Washington, LLC, TRT Holdings, Inc., Omni Hotels Management Corporation, David Ikasalo. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. TRT Holdings, Inc., Omni Mount Washington, LLC, and Omni Hotels Management Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by August 22, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-844-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from NH Superior Court, case number 215-2019-CV-00229 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1848761) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, David Ikasalo, TRT Holdings, Inc., Omni Mount Washington, LLC. Answer Follow Up on 9/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Jeremy Williams, #2 Exhibit B Documents in NH State Court Action, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Gamache, Heather) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElroy v. TRT Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ikasalo
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Mount Washington, LLC
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRT Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Represented By: C. Stephen Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace McElroy
Represented By: John B. Kenison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?