Luxottica Group S.p.A. v. Tibet Boutique LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Defendant: Urgen Tsomo, Life at the Beach, LLC, Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC, Tibet Boutique and Tibet Boutique LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00845
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to case by Luxottica Group S.p.A.(Christon, Rebecca)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #14 Notice of Settlement. Text of Order: The matter is stayed until October 19, 2019, pending finalization of settlement. On October 19, 2019, the stay will be lifted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Luxottica Group S.p.A.(Christon, Rebecca)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to October 4, 2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 10/4/2019. (de)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Urgen Tsomo by Luxottica Group S.p.A.. Served/Mailed on 9/13/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Christon, Rebecca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 4, 2019 filed by Life at the Beach, LLC, Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC, Tibet Boutique LLC, Urgen Tsomo.(Dutton, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Dutton on behalf of Life at the Beach, LLC, Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC, Tibet Boutique LLC, Urgen Tsomo Attorney Steven J. Dutton added to party Life at the Beach, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J. Dutton added to party Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J. Dutton added to party Tibet Boutique LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Steven J. Dutton added to party Urgen Tsomo(pty:dft).(Dutton, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Life at the Beach, LLC Replaces document no. 7 by Luxottica Group S.p.A.. Served/Mailed on 8/23/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Christon, Rebecca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC Replaces document. no. 6 by Luxottica Group S.p.A.. Served/Mailed on 8/23/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Christon, Rebecca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Tibet Boutique LLC Replaces document no. 5 by Luxottica Group S.p.A.. Served/Mailed on 8/23/2019. Answer Follow Up on 9/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Christon, Rebecca)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Certificate of Service filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., #6 Certificate of Service filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., #7 Certificate of Service filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A. Filer used wrong event. Filer shall refile each return separately using the Return of Service Executed event and enter in docket text: Replaces document no. 5, Replaces document. no. 6, Replaces document no. 7. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 8/29/2019.(js)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 REFILED. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luxottica Group S.p.A. re: #3 Summons - Waiver Issued, Life at the Beach, LLC (Christon, Rebecca) Modified on 8/28/2019 to add: Refiled (js).
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 REFILED. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luxottica Group S.p.A. re: #3 Summons - Waiver Issued, Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc, LLC (Christon, Rebecca) Modified on 8/28/2019 to add: Refiled(js).
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 REFILED. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Luxottica Group S.p.A. re: #3 Summons - Waiver Issued, Tibet Boutique, LLC (Christon, Rebecca) Modified on 8/28/2019 to add refiled. (js).
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (mc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Life at the Beach, LLC, Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC, Tibet Boutique LLC, Urgen Tsomo. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-845-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Luxottica Group S.p.A. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Christon, Rebecca)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1849107 filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Tibet Summons, #3 Summons - Waiver Life, #4 Summons - Waiver Ocean, #5 Summons - Waiver Urgen)(Christon, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.p.A. v. Tibet Boutique LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urgen Tsomo
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life at the Beach, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Breeze Gifts Etc LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibet Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibet Boutique LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: Rebecca C. Christon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?