Dooley v. Linden Care, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Dooley
Defendant: Linden Care, LLC and Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00898
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to November 15, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: The Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 11/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 15, 2019 filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Attorney John C. LaLiberte added to party Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.(pty:dft).(LaLiberte, John)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Sean E. Sanders complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/4/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Michelle L. Greenberg complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/4/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Kendra E. Pannitti complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/4/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Sean E. Sanders, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1878428.) filed by Linden Care, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Ferrari, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Michelle L. Greenberg, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1878424.) filed by Linden Care, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Ferrari, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Kendra E. Pannitti, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1878420.) filed by Linden Care, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Ferrari, Christina)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Ann Ferrari on behalf of Linden Care, LLC Attorney Christina Ann Ferrari added to party Linden Care, LLC(pty:dft).(Ferrari, Christina)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J. Sackman on behalf of Linden Care, LLC Attorney Edward J. Sackman added to party Linden Care, LLC(pty:dft).(Sackman, Edward)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Linden Care, LLC by Paul Dooley. Served/Mailed on 9/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Becker, Leif)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. by Paul Dooley. Served/Mailed on 9/11/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rainboth, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leif A. Becker on behalf of Paul Dooley Attorney Leif A. Becker added to party Paul Dooley(pty:pla).(Becker, Leif)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Linden Care, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
September 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-898-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1858042 filed by Paul Dooley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Linden Care, #3 Summons - Waiver RDC)(Rainboth, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley v. Linden Care, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linden Care, LLC
Represented By: Michelle L. Greenberg
Represented By: Kendra E. Pannitti
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Christina Ann Ferrari
Represented By: Sean E. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.
Represented By: John C. LaLiberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dooley
Represented By: Michael P. Rainboth
Represented By: Leif A. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?