Damboise et al v. Home Depot Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Steven Damboise and Doris Ann Damboise
Defendant: Home Depot Corporation, Home Depot Store #3403, Compact Power Equipment, Inc. and Home Depot USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00919
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, with jury demand filed by Compact Power Equipment, Inc., Home Depot Store #3403, Home Depot USA, Inc..(Steere, Douglas)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 11/13/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by Steven Damboise, Doris Ann Damboise.. Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Hutchins, Peter)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-00600, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appearance, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Consumer Protection Letter, #4 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Motion to Extend, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit Return of Service, #8 Exhibit Summons)(Steere, Douglas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ///ORDER granting #3 Motion to Amend Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2019.(gla) Modified on 10/1/2019 to add:/// (ko).
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Compact Power Equipment, Inc., Home Depot Corporation, Home Depot Store #3403.(Steere, Douglas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Home Depot Corporation disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Steere, Douglas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Home Depot Store #3403 disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Steere, Douglas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Compact Power Equipment, Inc., Home Depot Corporation, Home Depot Store #3403 disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Steere, Douglas)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Partially Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, Complaint to Substitute Party Defendants filed by Doris Ann Damboise, Steven Damboise. Follow up on Objection on 9/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hutchins, Peter)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REFILED SEE DOC. NO. #3 . Partially Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, Complaint to Substitute Party Defendants filed by Doris Ann Damboise, Steven Damboise. Follow up on Objection on 9/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hutchins, Peter) Modified on 9/13/2019 to add: refiled text(ko).
September 10, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Home Depot Corporation, Compact Power Equipment, Inc., Home Depot Store #3403. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Home Depot Corporation, Compact Power Equipment, Inc., Home Depot Store #3403 shall file a disclosure statement by September 17, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 9/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
September 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-919-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2019-cv-00600 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1859686) filed by Compact Power Equipment, Inc., Home Depot Corporation, Home Depot Store #3403. Answer Follow Up on 9/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Returns of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Assented-To Motion to Extend Return Date)(Steere, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damboise et al v. Home Depot Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Corporation
Represented By: Douglas N. Steere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Store #3403
Represented By: Douglas N. Steere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compact Power Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas N. Steere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas N. Steere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Damboise
Represented By: Joseph Kelly Levasseur
Represented By: Peter E. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Ann Damboise
Represented By: Joseph Kelly Levasseur
Represented By: Peter E. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?