West Stone Works Co., Inc. v. Sabbow & Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: West Stone Works Co., Inc.
Defendant: Sabbow & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00926
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Sabbow & Co., Inc..(Parker, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sabbow & Co., Inc. by West Stone Works Co., Inc.. Served/Mailed on 9/10/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ewing, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (ej)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Sabbow & Co., Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
September 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-926-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by West Stone Works Co., Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ewing, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1860558 filed by West Stone Works Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Photo of Laubi Headstone, #2 Exhibit A-2 Copyright Registration Application, #3 Exhibit A-3 Certification of Registration, #4 Exhibit A-4 2004 Drawing, #5 Exhibit A-5 2003 Concept Research, #6 Exhibit A-6 Screenshot of JAD-499, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons - Waiver)(Ewing, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Stone Works Co., Inc. v. Sabbow & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabbow & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Stone Works Co., Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?