Parvin v. Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harley C. Parvin
Defendant: Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC, Jason Cape and Beth Cape
Case Number: 1:2019cv00940
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 12/11/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with jury demand filed by Beth Cape, Jason Cape, Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC.(Mordecai, Adam)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam R. Mordecai on behalf of Beth Cape, Jason Cape, Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC Attorney Adam R. Mordecai added to party Beth Cape(pty:dft), Attorney Adam R. Mordecai added to party Jason Cape(pty:dft), Attorney Adam R. Mordecai added to party Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft).(Mordecai, Adam)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants (main document is executed waiver as to Defendant Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC) by Harley C. Parvin. Served/Mailed on 10/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/10/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver (waiver of service executed by Defendant Jason Cape), #2 Summons - Waiver (waiver of service executed by Defendant Beth Cape))(Frizzell, Jonathan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand (filed per Court Order issued 09/19/19) filed by Harley C. Parvin.(Frizzell, Jonathan)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint and To Request an Order on Service of Process. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Beth Cape, Jason Cape, Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-940-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint - New Case, and To Request an Order on Service of Process filed by Harley C. Parvin. Follow up on Objection on 9/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order on Motion)(Frizzell, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1861571 filed by Harley C. Parvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit - Golda Bella, #3 Notice of Lawsuit - Jason Cape, #4 Notice of Lawsuit - Beth Cape, #5 Summons - Waiver to Golda Bella (unexecuted), #6 Summons - Waiver to Jason Cape (unexecuted), #7 Summons - Waiver to Beth Cape (unexecuted))(Frizzell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parvin v. Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golda Bella Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cape
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Cape
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley C. Parvin
Represented By: Jonathan S. Frizzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?