Winthrop v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Winthrop
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00979
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE FORM Filed. The parties are directed to file a CONSENT FORM within 48 hours of this notice. (See doc. no. #2 ) (vln)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip L. Pettis on behalf of Elizabeth Winthrop Attorney Philip L. Pettis added to party Elizabeth Winthrop(pty:pla).(Pettis, Philip)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 11/18/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation.(Gamache, Heather)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that C. STEPHEN SETLIFF submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1871872.) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Eli Jason S. Mackey)(Gamache, Heather)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1871859.) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of C. Stephen Setliff)(Gamache, Heather)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 214-2019-CV-00113, Coos County Superior Court(Gamache, Heather)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Gamache, Heather)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Omni Hotels Management Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by September 25, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 9/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(mc)
September 17, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-979-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Coos Superior Court, case number 214-2019-CV-00113 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1863737) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 10/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Removal)(Gamache, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winthrop v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Winthrop
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Griffin
Represented By: Philip L. Pettis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: C. Stephen Setliff
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?