Winsor v. TBD Pizza et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Winsor
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1-10, Robert Rivard, TBD Pizza, John Doe 1-10 and Eric DeLorenzo
Case Number: 1:2019cv00992
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Addendum/ to #9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1891841.) by Joshua Winsor. (Bedard, Biron)
November 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re: #9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Joshua Winsor. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1 - No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 9. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 11/25/2019.(kad)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Frank V. Raimond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1891841.) filed by Joshua Winsor.Follow up on Objection on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) In Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Affidavit)(Bedard, Biron)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: As not all parties have been served in the case, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The court will schedule the pretrial conference once all defendants have been served or upon the expiration of time allowed for service on remaining defendants under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Attorneys Andrew P. Kimble, Esq., Phillip J. Krzeski, Esq. and Frank V. Raimond Esq. are not permitted to appear or practice before this court in this action until such time as motions for admission pro hac vice are filed and the required fee is paid, and they are not entitled to receive court notices and orders or pleadings filed by the parties in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 12/3/2019. (kad)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza.(Lynch, Tara)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tara E. Lynch on behalf of Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza Attorney Tara E. Lynch added to party Robert P. Rivard(pty:dft), Attorney Tara E. Lynch added to party TBD Pizza(pty:dft).(Lynch, Tara)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Robert P. Rivard by Joshua Winsor. Served/Mailed on 10/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to TBD Pizza by Joshua Winsor. Served/Mailed on 10/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 10/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bedard, Biron)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Eric DeLorenzo, Robert P. Rivard, TBD Pizza. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Andrew P. Kimble, Esq., Phillip J. Krzeski, Esq., Frank V. Raimond, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 10/24/2019. (bt)
September 23, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (bt)
September 23, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-992-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1866991 filed by Joshua Winsor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons - Waiver , #3 Summons - Waiver , #4 Summons - Waiver )(Bedard, Biron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winsor v. TBD Pizza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rivard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBD Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric DeLorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Winsor
Represented By: Biron L. Bedard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?