Wallace v. New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leah Wallace
Defendant: New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01049
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by K. Joshua Scott on behalf of New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc. Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.(pty:dft).(Scott, K.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ford, Debra)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Weiss Ford on behalf of New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc. Attorney Debra Weiss Ford added to party New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ford, Debra)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc. by Leah Wallace. Served/Mailed on 10/11/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(List, Sean)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons and Waiver issued electronically as to New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
October 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1049-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1872482 filed by Leah Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dis. & Not. of Rights, EEOC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Summons, #5 Waiver)(List, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Wallace
Represented By: Sean Robert List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Ball Bearings, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?