Jackson v. Autoserv Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Felicia Jackson
Defendant: G&S Management Corporation and Autoserv Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01050
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Autoserv Management LLC, G&S Management Corporation with jury demand filed by Felicia Jackson.(Leonard, C.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by G&S Management Corporation disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Autoserv Management LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 21, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No Disclosure Statements Filed. Defendants are directed to file disclosure statements by 10/23/2019. Disclosure Statements due by 10/23/2019.(ko)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 211-2019-CV-00296, Belknap County Superior Court(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 11/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 12, 2019 filed by Autoserv Management LLC, G&S Management Corporation.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Kevin Leonard on behalf of Felicia Jackson (Leonard, C.)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Autoserv Management LLC, G&S Management Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Autoserv Management LLC and G&S Management Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by October 11, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 10/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
October 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1050-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Belknap County Superior Court, case number 211-2019-CV-00296 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1872622) filed by G&S Management Corporation, Autoserv Management LLC. Answer Follow Up on 10/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2. Notice of Removal Pursuant to NH RSA 354-A:21-a, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sibbernsen, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Autoserv Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&S Management Corporation
Represented By: Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoserv Management LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Jackson
Represented By: C. Kevin Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?