Boston Fog LLC v. Ryobi Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Boston Fog LLC
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. and One World Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01076
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Restauri on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. Attorney Nicholas Restauri added to party One World Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Restauri added to party Ryobi Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Restauri added to party Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (pty:dft).(Restauri, Nicholas)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C White on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. Attorney Jason C White added to party One World Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason C White added to party Ryobi Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jason C White added to party Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (pty:dft).(White, Jason)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Jason C. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion for Nicholas A. Restauri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(vln)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (vln)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (George, Wayne)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 19, 2019 filed by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(George, Wayne)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Nicholas A. Restauri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1894041.) filed by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Restauri Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(George, Wayne)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Jason C. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1894024.) filed by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) White Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(George, Wayne)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. Attorney Wayne E. George added to party One World Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Wayne E. George added to party Ryobi Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Wayne E. George added to party Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (pty:dft).(George, Wayne)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Ryobi Technologies, Inc. by Boston Fog LLC. Served/Mailed on 10/29/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lambert, Gary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. by Boston Fog LLC. Served/Mailed on 10/29/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lambert, Gary)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to One World Technologies, Inc. by Boston Fog LLC. Served/Mailed on 10/29/2019. Answer Follow Up on 11/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lambert, Gary)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses issued electronically as to One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ryobi Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. with jury demand filed by Boston Fog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9414580, #2 Exhibit B - Accused Product, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart, #4 Summons - Waiver, #5 Summons - Waiver)(Lambert, Gary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #6 Summons - Waiver) (ej).
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (ej)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by Boston Fog LLC(Lambert, Gary)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Boston Fog LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lambert, Gary)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Boston Fog LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Boston Fog LLC shall file a disclosure statement by October 24, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 10/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
October 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1076-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1876608 filed by Boston Fog LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 9,414,580, #2 Exhibit B - Accused Product, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Waiver)(Lambert, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Fog LLC v. Ryobi Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C White
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Nicholas Restauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C White
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Nicholas Restauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C White
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Nicholas Restauri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Fog LLC
Represented By: Gary Ervery Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?