Vasquez et al v. ESIS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Javier Vasquez and Clorinda Vasquez
Defendant: ESIS, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01119
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Pleading Deadline. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 1/10/2020. (jb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Pleading Deadline filed by ESIS, Inc..(Suslak, Brian)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Suslak on behalf of ESIS, Inc. Attorney Brian Andrew Suslak added to party ESIS, Inc.(pty:dft).(Suslak, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, Civil Cover and ECF Notice as to ESIS, Inc. filed by Javier Vasquez. Served/Mailed on 11/21/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Noonan, D.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to ESIS, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(jb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ESIS, Inc. with jury demand filed by Javier Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Noonan, D.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to ESIS, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1119-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1882724 filed by Javier Vasquez, Clorinda Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Noonan, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez et al v. ESIS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Vasquez
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clorinda Vasquez
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESIS, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Andrew Suslak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?