Belmont v. Bower et al
Plaintiff: Judson Randolph Belmont
Defendant: Emily Renee Faulks, Carilion Clinic and Katie Love Bower
Case Number: 1:2019cv01155
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses issued by mail - given in hand to plaintiff, as to Katie Love Bower, Carilion Clinic, Emily Renee Faulks. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Judson Randolph Belmont (ed)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued by mail as to Katie Love Bower, Carilion Clinic, Emily Renee Faulks. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc) Modified on 11/18/2019 to add: issued by mail (mc).
November 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1155-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katie Love Bower, Carilion Clinic, Emily Renee Faulks with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number 14649018548) filed by Judson Randolph Belmont. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notices/Waivers of Summons) (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belmont v. Bower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Renee Faulks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carilion Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Love Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judson Randolph Belmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?