Klein v. Foremost Insurance Group
Plaintiff: Steven Klein
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv01187
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/10/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2020 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 10/13/2020. JERS Statement due 10/13/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/27/2020.(js)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving with changes #12 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/13/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/28/2020. Discovery deadline 6/30/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 5/1/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 7/10/2020. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/27/2020.(js)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The January 14, 2020 pretrial conference is cancelled. The court will issue a scheduling order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for and Order Excusing Gary Sheldon, Esq. from attendance during the pendancy of this matter. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Foremost Insurance Group. (Sheldon, Gary)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for an Order excusing Gary Sheldon, Esq. from attendance during the pendancy of this matter filed by Foremost Insurance Group.(Sheldon, Gary)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion for Paul E. Dwyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Assented to Motion for Clint D. Watts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #7 Assented to MOTION for Clint D. Watts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1905617.) filed by Foremost Insurance Group(Sheldon, Gary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #6 Assented to MOTION for Paul E. Dwyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1905614.) filed by Foremost Insurance Group(Sheldon, Gary)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #7 & #8 Assented to MOTION for Clint D. Watts to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #6 Assented to MOTION for Paul E. Dwyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Foremost Insurance Group. The affidavits of proposed pro hac vice counsel do not contain all information as required under LR 83.2, specifically LR 83.2(b)(1)(E) & (F). Filer shall refile corrected affidavits using the Other Documents/Affidavit event and link the filings back to the originally filed motions. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 12/19/2019.(js)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Addendum/ to #7 Assented to MOTION for Clint D. Watts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1905617.) by Foremost Insurance Group. (Sheldon, Gary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Clint D. Watts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1905617.) filed by Foremost Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Clint D. Watts)(Sheldon, Gary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Paul E. Dwyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1905614.) filed by Foremost Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Paul E. Dwyer, Esq.)(Sheldon, Gary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2019-CV-00588, Strafford County Superior Court(Sheldon, Gary)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/7/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Foremost Insurance Group disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sheldon, Gary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Foremost Insurance Group.(Sheldon, Gary)
November 27, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
November 25, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1187-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Frederic Sheldon on behalf of Foremost Insurance Group (Sheldon, Gary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford Superior Courr, case number 219-2019-CV-00588 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1897124) filed by Foremost Insurance Group. Answer Follow Up on 12/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheldon, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Foremost Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Klein
Represented By: Mary K. Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Group
Represented By: Gary Frederic Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?