Life Insurance Company of North America v. Estate of Desma Oakes et al
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Colby Oickle, Donald Oakes, Estate of Desma Oakes and John Doe Nos. 1-4
Case Number: 1:2019cv01191
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Assented to Motion to Stay All Proceedings. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Estate of Desma Oakes.(Crance, Jason)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason R. Crance on behalf of Estate of Desma Oakes Attorney Jason R. Crance added to party Estate of Desma Oakes(pty:dft).(Crance, Jason)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America Attorney Brooks R. Magratten added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:pla).(Magratten, Brooks)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Colby Oickle filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Served/Mailed on 12/26/2019. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mailing to C. Oickle)(Rosen, Mark)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 ERISA Administrative Record filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Administrative Record maintained conventionally in Clerks Office Joint Statement of Material Facts Follow Up on 3/12/2020. ERISA Administrative Record Return Deadline 1/4/2021.(lw)
January 1, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Donald Oakes.(Zumbado, Hector)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion for Brooks R. Magratten to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(lw)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Donald Oakes by Life Insurance Company of North America. Served/Mailed on 12/12/2019. Answer Follow Up on 1/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). ERISA Administrative Record Due 1/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rosen, Mark)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Brooks R. Magratten to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1909983.) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brooks R. Magratten)(Rosen, Mark)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Estate of Desma Oakes by Life Insurance Company of North America. Served/Mailed on 12/4/2019. Answer Follow Up on 2/5/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rosen, Mark)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Estate of Desma Oakes, Donald Oakes, Colby Oickle. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(mc)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Brooks R. Magratten, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 1/2/2020. (mc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (mc)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1191-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Rosen, Mark)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1898158 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver re Estate of Desma Oakes, #3 Summons - Waiver re Donald Oakes, #4 Summons - Waiver re Colby Oickle)(Rosen, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Insurance Company of North America v. Estate of Desma Oakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Oickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Oakes
Represented By: Hector E. Zumbado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Desma Oakes
Represented By: Jason R. Crance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Mark B. Rosen
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?