Lamorak Insurance Company v. Goss International Americas, LLC
Plaintiff: Goss International Americas, LLC and Lamorak Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01235
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion for Kevin J. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(lw)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint - New Case. Text of Order: Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 5/19/2020. (lw)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Kevin J. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1936907.) filed by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A)(Netburn, Peter)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 19, 2020 filed by Lamorak Insurance Company.Follow up on Objection on 2/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Netburn, Peter)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Saunders Batchelder on behalf of Goss International Americas, LLC Attorney Andrea Saunders Batchelder added to party Goss International Americas, LLC(pty:dft).(Batchelder, Andrea)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Goss International Americas, LLC by Lamorak Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 12/19/2019. Answer Follow Up on 2/20/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Netburn, Peter)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Lamorak Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Netburn, Peter)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to Goss International Americas, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Request for Issuance of Corrected Summons by Lamorak Insurance Company.(Netburn, Peter)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE re #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Lamorak Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Lamorak Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by December 24, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 12/24/2019. (mc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Goss International Americas, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1235-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1907566 filed by Lamorak Insurance Company.(Netburn, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ed). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #3 /s/ Civil Cover Sheet) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamorak Insurance Company v. Goss International Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goss International Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter C. Netburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?