Pollock v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Plaintiff: Robyn J.B. Pollock
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv01260
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 2/12/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 02:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/16/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 3/16/2021. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/1/2020. Joint Statement re: Mediation Follow Up on 5/18/2020. Discovery deadline 10/17/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/17/2020. (lw)
February 11, 2020 NOTICE OF CANCELATION - Pretrial Conference scheduled for 2/12/2020 @ 10:30 a.m. has been canceled. (lw)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Murphy, Daniel)
January 9, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/6/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Federal National Mortgage Association's ANSWER to Complaint filed by the Plaintiff in Hillsborough Superior Court, NH filed by Federal National Mortgage Association.(Murphy, Daniel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-01072, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion to Enjoin Foreclosure, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Appearance of Daniel P. Murphy, Esq. In the State Court, #4 Exhibit Appearance of Sarah A. Billeri, Esq. in the State Court, #5 Notice ECF Notice of Removal from State Court, #6 Exhibit Certificate and Return of Service)(Murphy, Daniel)
December 26, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
December 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 19-cv-1260-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Murphy, Daniel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court, ND, case number 216-2019-CV-01072 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1911042) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Answer Follow Up on 1/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to Counsel of Removal, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollock v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Daniel P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn J.B. Pollock
Represented By: Randall Baldwin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?