USA v. Walther .32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Walther PP Pistol and Walther .32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467
Claimant: Patricia Renee Pina
Case Number: 1:2019cv01263
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:0924
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Se Motion to Obtain Permission to File Electronically filed by Patricia Renee Pina. Served on 2/7/2020 via CM/ECF. Follow up on Objection on 2/21/2020. (ko)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 CLAIM for Walther.32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467 by Patricia Renee Pina, Business Administrator. Answer Follow Up on 2/28/2020. (ko)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 CLAIM for Walther.32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467 by Patricia Renee Pina, wife. Answer Follow Up on 2/28/2020. (ko)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Patricia Letourneau , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 1/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 2/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Patricia Pina , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 1/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 2/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on John Higgins , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 1/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 2/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to Walther.32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467. (mc)
December 30, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1263-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: #3 Corrected Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Walther .32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walther PP Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walther .32 caliber PP Pistol, serial number 336467
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patricia Renee Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?