Taylor v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Angela Taylor
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation and Getinge AB
Case Number: 1:2019cv02780
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 20, 2019 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-2780-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number: 5:19-cv-00036. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to MDL Panel in District of New Hampshire. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 6/5/19. (slt) [Transferred from gasd on 6/20/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/17/2019. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 6/20/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angela Taylor. $400.00 Filing fee paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2604920. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 6/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getinge AB
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Represented By: Katherine E. Unger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Taylor
Represented By: Paul Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?