Gulfoslides, LLC et al v. Fortin
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee, Gulfoslides, LLC and Jarret Fortin
Case Number: 1:2019fp00833
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court served on 9/27/2019 filed by Jarret Fortin. Follow up on Reply on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K, #2 Envelope)(mc)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #5 MOTION for an Enlargement of Time in which to Respond to Motion for Remand. Text of Order: Granted in part, only to the extent that Fortin shall have until September 27, 2019 to file a response/objection. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objection on 9/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for an Enlargement of Time in which to Respond to Motion for Remand to: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court to October 4, 2019 filed by Jarret Fortin. Follow up on Objection on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exibit A Emails, #2 Envelope) (mc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher T. Hilson on behalf of Gulfoslides, LLC (Hilson, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gulfoslides, LLC. Attorney Christopher T. Hilson added to party Gulfoslides, LLC(pty:pla). Follow up on Objection on 9/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) 2 - Affidavit in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit 3 - NH SOS Website Info, #4 Exhibit 4 - Landlord and Tenant Writ)(Hilson, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Compliance Deadline set for 10/11/2019. (mc)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NH Circuit Court, 10th Circuit, District Division-Brentwood, case number 435-2019-LT-82 filed by Jarret Fortin. Answer Follow Up on 8/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Envelope) (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulfoslides, LLC et al v. Fortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulfoslides, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Hilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarret Fortin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?