Hughes v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary
Plaintiff: Kevin Hughes
Defendant: United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development and US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary
Case Number: 1:2020cv00025
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/24/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. (bt)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary.Follow up on Objection on 3/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A- Foreclosure Deed)(McCormack, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to February 21, 2020. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/21/2020. (de)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 21, 2020 filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary.(McCormack, Michael)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2019-CV-00789, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
January 6, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-25-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County State Court, case number 226-2019-cv-00789 (filing fee $400) filed by United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. Answer Follow Up on 1/27/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hughes
Represented By: Randall Baldwin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?