Laderbush et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Laderbush and George Robert Laderbush
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00062
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lee Balefsky on behalf of Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush (Balefsky, Lee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Cavaliere on behalf of Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush Attorney Michael A. Cavaliere added to party Bonnie Laderbush(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A. Cavaliere added to party George Robert Laderbush(pty:pla).(Cavaliere, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #44 MOTION for Lee Balefsky, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bt)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #43 MOTION for Michael Cavaliere, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth N. Mulvey on behalf of Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush Attorney Elizabeth N. Mulvey added to party Bonnie Laderbush(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth N. Mulvey added to party George Robert Laderbush(pty:pla).(Mulvey, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2020 Filing 47 Addendum/ to #44 MOTION for Lee Balefsky, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1936355.) by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush. (Suchecki, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 Electronically Signed Copy) (bt).
February 13, 2020 Filing 46 Addendum/ to #43 MOTION for Michael Cavaliere, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1936321.) by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush. (Suchecki, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #2 Electronically Signed Copy) (bt).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Partially Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to March 16, 2020 to Expand the Scope of Defendants' Pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/16/2020.(kad)
February 13, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing. Case Management Conference via Telephone Conference set for 3/10/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The court will email counsel to provide call-in information. (bt)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The clerk's office shall schedule a case management conference. The conference will be conducted by telephone. Counsel will receive call-in instructions from the clerk's office. The parties should meet and confer in advance of the case management conference in an effort to agree upon a proposed trial date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(bt)
February 12, 2020 Filing 45 Partially Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to March 16, 2020 to Expand the Scope of Defendants' Pending Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.Follow up on Objection on 2/26/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
February 12, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #43 MOTION for Michael Cavaliere, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #44 MOTION for Lee Balefsky, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1 - No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 43. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/24/2020.(kad)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - NO ACTION REQUIRED - re: #43 MOTION for Michael Cavaliere, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush, #44 MOTION for Lee Balefsky, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush. The Proposed Order should have been filed as an attachment to the main document/Motion(AP 2.5(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
February 10, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Lee Balefsky, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1936355.) filed by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush.Follow up on Objection on 2/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Suchecki, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Michael Cavaliere, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1936321.) filed by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush.Follow up on Objection on 2/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Suchecki, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David W. Suchecki on behalf of Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush Attorney David W. Suchecki added to party Bonnie Laderbush(pty:pla), Attorney David W. Suchecki added to party George Robert Laderbush(pty:pla).(Suchecki, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Certain Defense Counsel by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Attorney James M. Campbell added to party Ethicon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Campbell added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft).(Campbell, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Attorney Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle added to party Ethicon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft).(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint filed by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC., and Johnson & Johnson shall file a disclosure statement by January 28, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 1/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., Michelle L. Tiger, Esq., Priscilla E. Jimenez, Esq., Thomas R. Kline, Esq., Christy D. Jones, Esq., David B. Thomas, Esq., Melissa A. Merk, Esq., Philip J. Combs, Esq., Susan M. Robinson, Esq., Kari L. Sutherland, Esq., Molly E. Flynn, Esq., and William M. Gage, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 2/13/2020. (ed)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 9, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (ed)
January 9, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-62-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 9, 2020 Filing 36 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 2/10/2020. (ed)
January 9, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number: 2:13-cv-24258. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
December 31, 2019 Filing 34 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 2428 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF 2535 - Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #3 Exhibit ECF 2625 - Reply in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit ECF 6843 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF 6980 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF 7107 - Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF 2060 - Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF 2065 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF 2134 - Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF 2232 - Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF 2910 - Supplemental Response and Notice of Adoption, #12 Exhibit ECF 6860 - Notice of Adoption, #13 Exhibit ECF 6965 - Notice of Adoption, #14 Exhibit ECF 7143 - Notice of Adoption, #15 Exhibit ECF 1986 - Amended Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF 1988 - Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 Exhibit ECF 2143 - Response to Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF 3844 - Reply to Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF 6864 - Notice of Adoption, #20 Exhibit ECF 6973 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF 7119 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 33 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 2818 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit ECF 2931 - Memorandum in, #3 Exhibit ECF 3024 - Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit ECF 5332 - Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF 5333 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit ECF 5482 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #7 Exhibit ECF 5548 - Reply in Support of Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF 6852 - Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit ECF 6960 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF 2205 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF 2205 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF 2205 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF 2206 - Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions, #14 Exhibit ECF 2287 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 Exhibit ECF 2287 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #16 Exhibit ECF 2297 - Reply to Response in Opposition, #17 Exhibit ECF 2552 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF 2552 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF 2825 - Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF 2826 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #21 Exhibit ECF 2942 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF 3053 - Reply in Support of Motion, #23 Exhibit ECF 6824 - Notice of Adoption, #24 Exhibit ECF 6998 - Notice of Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF 7100 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 32 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 6648 - Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit ECF 6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF 6926 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF 7123 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF 2759 - Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF 2760 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Exhibit ECF 2949 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #8 Exhibit ECF 3017 - Reply in Support of Motion, #9 Exhibit ECF 6821 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF 6958 - Notice of Adoption, #11 Exhibit ECF 7177 - Notice of Adoption, #12 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 4 - Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 5 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 6 - Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 7 - Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 8 - Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 9 - Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 10 - Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 11 - Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 12 - Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 13 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF 2047 Part 14 - Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 238 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit ECF 239 - Ethicon, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit ECF 240 - Ethicon, LLC's Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 241 - Johnson & Johnson's Answer, #5 Exhibit ECF 262 - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 263 - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit ECF 3619 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF 3619 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF 3621 - Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #10 Exhibit ECF 3790 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #11 Exhibit ECF 3790 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 Exhibit ECF 3790 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion, #13 Exhibit ECF 3865 - Reply in Support of Motion, #14 Exhibit ECF 6874 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF 6874 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF 6874 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF 6875 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Exhibit ECF 7038 - Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF 7045 - Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #20 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Amended Adoption of Daubert Response, #21 Exhibit ECF 7183 - Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF 3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit Testimony, #23 Exhibit ECF 3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit Testimony, #24 Exhibit ECF 3630 - Memorandum in Support of Motion, #25 Exhibit ECF 3767 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #26 Exhibit ECF 3767 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #27 Exhibit ECF 3767 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #28 Exhibit ECF 3767 Part 4 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/1/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/09/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/08/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/19/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush in opposition to #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush to #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Linda Whitten on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of George Laderbush on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson re: #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Anne Kalter on June 13, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Bonnie Laderbush on April 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Anne Kalter on 3/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Bonnie Laderbush, George Robert Laderbush. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
March 10, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
February 26, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
March 4, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
November 14, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 3, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 72 (Order Amending PTO # 65 to Require Copies of Complaints Filed Under Delayed Filing Agreement) entered on 10/02/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 2, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]
October 2, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2688970. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 1/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laderbush et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC.
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Laderbush
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez
Represented By: Thomas R. Kline
Represented By: David W. Suchecki
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mulvey
Represented By: Michael A. Cavaliere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Robert Laderbush
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Michelle L. Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez
Represented By: Thomas R. Kline
Represented By: David W. Suchecki
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mulvey
Represented By: Michael A. Cavaliere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?