Hobgood v. Tribune Media Company
Plaintiff: James Daniel Hobgood
Defendant: Tribune Media Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00157
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #5 Order on Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (lw)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ///ORDER approving #3 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by James Daniel Hobgood. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lw)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: #1 Complaint, recommending that the district judge dismiss it for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Moreover, given the undisputed public record, there is no realistic possibility that amending the complaint would alter this outcome. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 3/17/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(mc)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-157-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by James Daniel Hobgood.(mc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tribune Media Company with Jury Demand filed by James Daniel Hobgood. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobgood v. Tribune Media Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribune Media Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Hobgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?