Leahy v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Eileen Leahy
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Jane Doe and TRT Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00180
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 5/18/2021 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 4/19/2021. JERS Statement due 4/19/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/3/2021. (js)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving with changes #10 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/15/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/18/2020. Discovery deadline 12/15/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 10/16/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 2/12/2021. Supplemental Statement Regarding ESI Deadline set for 4/20/2020.(js)
March 18, 2020 Notice of Cancellation of Pretrial Conference- Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 is CANCELLED. Order to issue. (js)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ///ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss TRT Holdings, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Text of Order: Plaintiff has filed nothing in response to the court's February 27, 2020 Order. Document number 5 is therefore granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Mackey, Eli Jason)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #5 MOTION to Dismiss. Text of Order: TRT Holdings, Inc. filed a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff had until 2/19/2020 to respond but has not done so. The plaintiff has the burden of proving personal jurisdiction. See Foster-Miller, Inc. v. Babcock & Wilcox Canada, 46 F.3d 138, 145 (1995). Plaintiff has until 3/13/2020 to file a motion with the court proffering evidence to support a finding that the court has personal jurisdiction over TRT Holdings, Inc. See Boit v. Gar-Tec Products, Inc., 967 F.2d 671, 675 (1992). If plaintiff does not file a responsive motion and meet their burden, the court will grant defendant's motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 212-2019-CV-00225, Carroll County Superior Court(Gamache, Heather)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 3/13/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles S. Setliff on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation TRT Holdings, Inc. Attorney Charles S. Setliff added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:dft).(Setliff, Charles)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation, TRT Holdings, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mackey, Eli Jason)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation.(Mackey, Eli Jason)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss TRT Holdings, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by TRT Holdings, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 2/19/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Mackey, Eli Jason)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eli Jason S. Mackey on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation, TRT Holdings, Inc. Attorney Eli Jason S. Mackey added to party Omni Hotels Management Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Eli Jason S. Mackey added to party TRT Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft).(Mackey, Eli Jason)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Assented to Motion for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Assented to Motion for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION for Eli Jason S. Mackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1934064.) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Eli Jason S. Mackey, Esq.)(Gamache, Heather)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION for C. Stephen Setliff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1934009.) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of C. Stephen Setliff, Esq.)(Gamache, Heather)
January 31, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
January 31, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-180-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Carroll Superior Court, case number 212-2019-CV-00225 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1931864) filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 2/21/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gamache, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leahy v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Represented By: Charles S. Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRT Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Eli Jason S. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Leahy
Represented By: Gregory V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?