Hardy et al v. Granite State Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ryan Hardy and Matthew O'Connor
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00216
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Ryan Hardy, Matthew O'Connor. Follow up on Reply on 4/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law i/s/o Obj to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 Underlying Hardy Tort Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 Underlying O'Connor Tort Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 Unreported State Court Decision)(Rehnborg, Gordon)
March 27, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 12/4/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 12/18/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Bench Trial set for the two-week period beginning 1/20/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #12 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 day. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order with the following modifications: Dispositive motions due 6/30/2020. Trial 1/20/2021. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/30/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/1/2020. Discovery deadline 9/1/2020. Joint Statement re: Mediation Follow Up on 11/1/2020.(lw)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Ryan Hardy. (Morrissette, Mark)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Granite State Insurance Company.Follow up on Objection on 4/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law i/s/o Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Holtslag, Tamara)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ///ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Dismiss. The defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint as may be appropriate under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, within the time allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Granite State Insurance Company First Amended Complaint filed by Ryan Hardy, Matthew O'Connor.(Rehnborg, Gordon)
February 28, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/25/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw)
February 28, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Errors re: #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Granite State Insurance Company. (1) Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). (2) No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holtslag, Tamara)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Granite State Insurance Company.Follow up on Objection on 3/12/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Holtslag, Tamara)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Granite State Insurance Company disclosing parent company, publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Holtslag, Tamara) Modified on 2/26/2020 to add: subsidiaries of Granite State Insurance Company (lw).
February 20, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 20-cv-216-SM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(jb)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. Case to be reassigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-cv-01122, Hillsborough Northern District County Superior Court(Holtslag, Tamara)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to February 27, 2020 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/27/2020. (jb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Morrissette on behalf of Ryan Hardy and Matthew O'Connor Attorney Mark D. Morrissette added to party Ryan Hardy(pty:pla).(Morrissette, Mark)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 27, 2020 filed by Granite State Insurance Company.(Holtslag, Tamara)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Granite State Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Granite State Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by February 13, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 2/13/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
February 6, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-216-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County Superior Court, SD, case number 216-2019-CV-1122 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1935232) filed by Granite State Insurance Co.. Answer Follow Up on 2/27/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holtslag, Tamara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2020: #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. Granite State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Tamara Smith Holtslag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hardy
Represented By: Gordon A. Rehnborg, Jr.
Represented By: Mark D. Morrissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew O'Connor
Represented By: Gordon A. Rehnborg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?