Hutchinson v. Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Kevin Hutchinson
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 1:2020cv00259
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 NOTICE of CANCELLATION: The Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2020 10:30 AM in CANCELLED. Order to issue. (vln)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Bauer, Charles)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER OF REFERENCE re: #6 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. It is ordered that this case be referred to United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73. The new case designation is: 1:20-cv-259-AJ, please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. Text of Order: Approved. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Bauer, Charles)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 4/3/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Documents)(Bauer, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/4/2020. (lw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 4, 2020 filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Bauer, Charles)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Pursuant to LR 7.1.1(b) parent companies should have been added to the docket within the disclosure docketing event. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. (mc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2019-CV-00807, Merrimack County Superior Court(Bauer, Charles)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
February 19, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-259-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Bauer, Charles) Modified on 2/24/2020 to remove: disclosing NO (mc).
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Merrimack County Superior Court, case number 217-2019-CV-00807 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1940639) filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Answer Follow Up on 3/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Superior Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauer, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Charles P. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hutchinson
Represented By: Christopher J. Seufert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?