Markovich v. Lincare Inc.
Plaintiff: Administrator Thomas D. Markovich and Thomas D. Markovich
Defendant: Lincare Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00305
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew M Abraham on behalf of Thomas D. Markovich Attorney Andrew M Abraham added to party Thomas D. Markovich(pty:pla).(Abraham, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #7 Proposed Discovery Plan Stipulated. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan Stipulated filed by Lincare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/27/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Lincare Inc..(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to MOTION for Andrew M. Abraham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Andrew M. Abraham to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1953468.) filed by Thomas D. Markovich.Follow up on Objection on 4/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Abraham)(Quinn, Francis) Modified on 3/19/2020 to add Assented text (jb).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer E. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb) Modified on 3/19/2020 to add local counsel text (jb).
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2020-cv-00103, Rockingham County Superior Court(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer E. McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1951487.) filed by Lincare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of McDonald)(Rattigan, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Lincare Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rattigan, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
March 4, 2020 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Lincare Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Lincare Inc shall file a disclosure statement by March 12, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 3/12/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
March 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-305-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2020-cv-00103 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1947272) filed by Lincare Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 3/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice ECF Notice of Removal for State and Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rattigan, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markovich v. Lincare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrator Thomas D. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Markovich
Represented By: Francis X. Quinn, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew M Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Rattigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?