Champney v. Apple New England, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alan Champney
Defendant: Apple American Group II, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group, LP, Apple American Group, LLC and Apple New England, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00397
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple New England, LLC with jury demand First Amended Complaint filed by Alan Champney.(Fagan, John)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Replaces document no. 4 filed by Alan Champney.Follow up on Objection on 6/18/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Fagan, John)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Notice (Other) filed by Alan Champney. Filer used wrong event. Filer shall refile using the Motion for Leave to File event and enter in docket text: Replaces document no. 4. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 6/12/2020.(js)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 REFILED SEE DOC. NO. 5 NOTICE of Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 15(a)(1)(B) by Alan Champney. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Fagan, John) Modified on 6/4/2020 to add: Refiled text(js).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 ///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Apple American Group, LLC, Apple American Group II, LLC and Flynn Restaurant Group, LP Only by Alan Champney(Fagan, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Apple American Group II, LLC, Apple American Group, LLC, Apple New England, LLC, Flynn Restaurant Group, LP. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
March 30, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-397-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1957278 filed by Alan Champney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Fagan, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2020: #3 Summonses) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champney v. Apple New England, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple American Group II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flynn Restaurant Group, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple American Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple New England, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Champney
Represented By: John P. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?