Dollar Deluxe, LLC v. US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service
Plaintiff: Dollar Deluxe LLC and Dollar Deluxe, LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture and US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv00405
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #7 Affidavit of Service of Original Complaint and Appeal of Administrative Decision filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Original Complaint and Appeal of Administrative Decision as to Scott W. Murray filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC.(Mathews, Keith)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint - New Case. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(lw)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 28, 2020 filed by US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service. Attorney Frances Susan Cohen added to party US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service(pty:dft).(Cohen, Frances)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Affidavit of Service, filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC, #5 Affidavit of Service, filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Original Complaint and Appeal of Administrative Decision as to US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service on Secretary Perdue filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC. Served/Mailed on 4/13/2020. Answer Follow Up on 5/4/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mathews, Keith)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Original Complaint and Appeal of Administrative Decision as to US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service on US Attorney General filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC. Served/Mailed on 4/20/2020. Answer Follow Up on 5/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mathews, Keith)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Dollar Deluxe, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mathews, Keith)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE re #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Dollar Deluxe, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Dollar Deluxe, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by April 10, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 4/10/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-405-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1959137 filed by Dollar Deluxe LLC.(Mathews, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for AUSA, #3 Summons for USDA) (mc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #4 Summons US Atty General) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dollar Deluxe, LLC v. US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture-Food and Nutrition Service
Represented By: Frances Susan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollar Deluxe LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollar Deluxe, LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?