Woodham v. Franconia PD et al
Plaintiff: Grace Woodham
Defendant: Franconia PD and Martin Gashin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00413
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Referring Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as to Grace Woodham, initial fee of $-0-. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to the plaintiffs account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. Finance Follow Up Deadline 7/6/2020 (mc)
April 27, 2020 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. New case number is 1:20-cv-413-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Grace Woodham. (mc)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form.Compliance Deadline set for 6/5/2020.(mc)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Franconia PD, Martin Gashin with Jury Demand filed by Grace Woodham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodham v. Franconia PD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Woodham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franconia PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Gashin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?