Ely v. East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Ely
Defendant: Does 1-10, East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Matthew Rose, Michael L. Rose, Rose Enterprises, LLC and Stephanie Rose Cudney
Case Number: 1:2020cv00442
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #8 MOTION for J. Michael Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #9 MOTION for Steven D. Shafron to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Michael L. Rose. The documents fail to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 8 & 9. The documents will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Compliance Deadline set for 6/8/2020.(lw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Steven D. Shafron to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1984116.) filed by East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Michael L. Rose.Follow up on Objection on 6/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration of Steven D. Shafron)(Butenhof, Ann)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for J. Michael Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1984096.) filed by East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Michael L. Rose.Follow up on Objection on 6/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration of J. Michael Murray)(Butenhof, Ann)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Move or Plead to the Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/2/2020. (lw)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Butenhof, Ann)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Move or Plead to the Complaint to July 2, 2020 filed by East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Michael L. Rose. Attorney Ann N. Butenhof added to party East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ann N. Butenhof added to party Michael L. Rose(pty:dft).(Butenhof, Ann)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Jarrett L. Ellzey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(ko)
April 21, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 MOTION for Jarrett L. Ellzey to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Nicole Ely. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Jarrett L. Ellzey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1966143.) filed by Nicole Ely.Follow up on Objection on 5/4/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Exhibit Affidavit of Jarrett L. Ellzey, #2 Attachment to Exhibit State Bar of Texas)(Roever, Howard)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for John P. Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(ko)
April 20, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 MOTION for John P. Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Nicole Ely. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for John P. Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1965232.) filed by Nicole Ely.Follow up on Objection on 5/1/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of John P. Kristensen)(Roever, Howard)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Notice of Consent to Sue Form for Alessandra Clivio by Nicole Ely. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF Consent Form for Wage Claim)(Roever, Howard)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Stephanie Rose Cudney, East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC, Matthew Rose, Michael L. Rose, Rose Enterprises, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
April 10, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
April 9, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-442-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1962008 filed by Howard A Roever. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver, #5 Summons - Waiver, #6 Summons - Waiver)(Roever, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ely v. East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Restaurant & Nightclubs, LLC
Represented By: Ann N. Butenhof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Rose
Represented By: Ann N. Butenhof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Rose Cudney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ely
Represented By: Howard A. Roever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?