Mullen v. Kissell et al
Plaintiff: Martha Mullen
Defendant: Ms. FNU Smith, Edward J. Kissell, Jr., Teacher Witnesses, Kristin Gallo, Ms. FNU Noyes, Andrea McGahan and Hildegarde Fyfe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00473
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 NOTICE re #17 MOTION for Contempt filed by Martha Mullen. Although the clerk's office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that attachment to the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted document in its entirety and add to the title of the filing, Replacement for doc. no. 17, and file a motion to seal the attachments to the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available.(lw)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Contempt filed by Martha Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(lw)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Accept Additional Attachments filed by Martha Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(lw)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Accept Additional Information filed by Martha Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(lw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Martha Mullen.(lw)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Accept All Attachments filed by Martha Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(lw)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER #11 Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance. Text of Order: Plaintiff's Request for Summonses (Doc. No. 11) is denied without prejudice, pending the outcome of the courts preliminary review. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension. Text of Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension (Doc. No. 8), which the court construes as a request to extend the deadline to respond to the court's Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 5), is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her response to the report and recommendation on or before August 7, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 8/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(lw)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for to Correct. Text of Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendant (Doc. No. 7) is GRANTED The Clerk's office shall add Hildegarde Fyfe as a defendant in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Martha Mullen.(lw)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #6 Motion in Limine: Disqualification of Steven McAuliffe. Text of Order: Denied; the duty to sit absent a basis for recusal is as compelling as the duty to recuse if a basis for recusal exists. Here, there is no legitimate grounds warranting recusal. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension filed by Martha Mullen.(lw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Correct filed by Martha Mullen. Follow up on Objection on 7/23/2020. (lw)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying in part #6 Motion in Limine: Disqualification of Steven McAuliffe. Text of Order: Plaintiff has filed a motion to disqualify Judge Steven McAuliffe, the presiding judge (Doc. No. 6), whom she misidentifies as a Magistrate Judge. That motion (Doc. No. 6) is denied, in part, to the extent it seeks the disqualification of the undersigned Magistrate Judge, as there are no proper grounds for my recusal. See generally 28 U.S.C. 455. The remaining relief sought in the motion to disqualify (Doc. No. 6) is taken under advisement for consideration by Judge McAuliffe to the extent it seeks his disqualification. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lw)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION in Limine: Disqualification of Steven McAuliffe filed by Martha Mullen.(ko)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, recommending the district judge should dismiss the complaint as to defendant Edward J. Kissell for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice to the plaintiff's ability to assert her claims in a state court of competent jurisdiction. The remaining claims should be dismissed for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed within fourteen days of receipt of this notice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 7/13/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ko)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (mc)
June 9, 2020 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. New case number is 1:20-cv-473-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental Complaint/MOTION for Additional Information for Court Justice filed by Martha Mullen.(mc) Modified on 6/30/2020: The court construes the motion as a supplemental complaint per #5 Order dated June 29, 2020 (ko).
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Martha Mullen.(mc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Compliance Deadline set for 6/22/2020.(mc)
April 21, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristin Gallo, Edward J. Kissell, Jr, Andrea McGahan, FNU Noyes, FNU Smith, Teacher Witnesses filed by Martha Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents-part 1, #2 Supporting Documents-part 2)(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullen v. Kissell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. FNU Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Kissell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teacher Witnesses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. FNU Noyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea McGahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildegarde Fyfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?