Moore v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Moore
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00491
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (vln)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER MDL FINAL ORDER case is transferred to Northern District of California for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. MDL No. 2741 (vln)
May 6, 2020 NOTICE of MDL Minute Order. MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-207) Finalized on 5/6/20 in MDL No. 2741.As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/6/2020.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, ID/1:20-cv-00134, LAM/3:20-cv-00243, MN/0:20-cv-00987, MN/0:20-cv-00988, MN/0:20-cv-01000, MN/0:20-cv-01001, NE/8:20-cv-00156, NE/8:20-cv-00157, NE/8:20-cv-00158, NH/1:20-cv-00491, NYE/1:20-cv-00377, NYE/1:20-cv-00823, NYE/1:20-cv-01361, NYN/1:20-cv-00295, NYS/1:20-cv-02316 (CMD) (vln)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the complaint sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Public Docket Sheet) (mc)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Monsanto Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-491-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1967583 filed by Thomas Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Angueira, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2020: #3 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Moore
Represented By: David P. Angueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?