Montshire Agency, LLC v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Montshire Agency, LLC
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00499
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Kfoury, Paul)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/1/2020. (vln)
May 1, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #9 Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment filed by Montshire Agency, LLC. The Consent Form must include the electronic signature of all counsel of record. Counsel is directed to refile doc. no 9. Compliance Deadline set for 5/8/2020.(vln)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Kfoury, Paul)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Kfoury, Paul)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Montshire Agency, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Kfoury, Paul)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul R. Kfoury, Sr on behalf of Montshire Agency, LLC (Kfoury, Paul)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Montshire Agency, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by May 21, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 5/21/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by May 7, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 5/7/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2020-cv-305, Hillsborough County Northern District County Superior Court(Van Oot, Martha)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 1, 2020 filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Van Oot, Martha)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Van Oot, Martha)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (mc)
April 23, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-499-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Northern District, case number 216-2020-cv-305 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1967996) filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 5/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Oot, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montshire Agency, LLC v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Martha Van Oot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montshire Agency, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Kfoury, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?