Taylor v. Albany International Corp.
Plaintiff: Tiffany Taylor
Defendant: Albany International Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00565
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to July 23, 2020. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 23, 2020 filed by Albany International Corp..(Pandolph, William)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to July 9, 2020. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 9, 2020 filed by Albany International Corp..(Pandolph, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D. Pandolph on behalf of Albany International Corp. Attorney William D. Pandolph added to party Albany International Corp.(pty:dft).(Pandolph, William)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Albany International Corp. by Tiffany Taylor. Served/Mailed on 5/19/2020. Answer Follow Up on 6/9/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). ERISA Administrative Record Due 6/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sacht, Christopher)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Albany International Corp. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(mc)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
May 12, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
May 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-565-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1976259 filed by Tiffany Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Sacht, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Albany International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Taylor
Represented By: Christopher Michael Sacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?