Cole v. Nora Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Cole
Defendant: Nora Systems, Inc. and Interface Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00668
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/2/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 10/1/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/15/2021.(vln)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving in part #5 Discovery Plan.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/2/2021. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 7/6/2021.(vln) Modified on 7/22/2020 to remove "ENDORSED" (vln).
July 17, 2020 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone is CANCELLED. Order to issue. (vln)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Nora Systems, Inc.. (Mordecai, Adam)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 7/16/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Interface Americas, Inc., Nora Systems, Inc..(Mordecai, Adam)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2020-cv-00542, Rockingham County Superior Court(Mordecai, Adam)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Interface Americas, Inc., Nora Systems, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Attorney Adam R. Mordecai added to party Interface Americas, Inc.(pty:dft).(Mordecai, Adam)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, filed by Nora Systems, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Nora Systems, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by June 11, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 6/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-668-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2020-CV-00542 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1987415) filed by nora systems, inc.. Answer Follow Up on 6/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mordecai, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Nora Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interface Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Cole
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wyatt
Represented By: Michael Varraso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?