Fortt v. USA
Petitioner: Tschaka Fortt
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00685
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; and granting: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (SHORT FORM). Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(mc)
July 2, 2020 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. New case number is 1:20-cv-685-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate filed by Tschaka Fortt.(mc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 8/10/2020. (mc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (SHORT FORM) filed by Tschaka Fortt.(mc)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Tschaka Fortt. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortt v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tschaka Fortt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?