Armstrong v. USA
Petitioner: Christopher Armstrong
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00686
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Text of Order: Petitioner Christopher Armstrong has filed a motion (Doc. No. 4) seeking court-appointed counsel. The court has not yet conducted preliminary review, and therefore the court cannot determine at this time that the appointment of counsel is necessary to protect the petitioners rights. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED without prejudice to Mr. Armstrong's ability to reassert his request after preliminary review in this case has been conducted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher Armstrong.(de)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: As petitioner has paid the filing fee, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
June 30, 2020 Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $ 5 (Check), receipt number 14649019441 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. New case number is 1:20-cv-686-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: COMPLETE Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 8/10/2020. (ed)
June 10, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with INCOMPLETE Custodial Certificate filed by Christopher Armstrong. (ed)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (ed)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241. Date petition received: June 8, 2020 filed by Christopher Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Claim, #2 Exhibit 1 Evidence of a Void Bill, #3 Envelope) (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?