Blair v. Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Blair
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA Inc., Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc. and Crescent Plowing Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00737
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REMANDED to Rockingham County County Superior Court. Certified copy of order and docket entries sent to State Court Clerk. (kad)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to MOTION to Remand to State Court ; denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #8 Partially Assented to MOTION to Remand to State Court PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) to State Court. CASE REMANDED to Rockingham County County Superior Court. Text of Order: Motion to remand (Doc. no. 10) is granted. Doc. no. 5 and 8 are denied as moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Mordecai, Adam)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Remand to State Court , Assented to MOTION to Remand filed by Securitas Security Services USA Inc..(Mordecai, Adam)
July 22, 2020 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - ACTION REQUIRED - re: Crescent Plowing Services, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. Crescent Plowing Services, LLC must file a Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Disclosure Statement due 7/29/2020. (kad)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Consent form shall be filed within 48 hours of this notice.(kad)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Partially Assented to MOTION to Remand to State Court PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) filed by Crescent Plowing Services, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 7/28/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A/ 2019 Annual Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B/Crescent's Answer & Appearance, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, 2020 Annual Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D/ Assented to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E/ GRANTED Motion to Amend Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F/Answer to Amended Complaint)(Getman, Naomi)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Durney, Peter)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc. (Durney, Peter)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 8/4/2020. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Securitas Security Services USA Inc.. If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion.Follow up on Objection on 7/21/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In support of motion to dismiss)(Mordecai, Adam)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2019-CV-01826, Rockingham County Superior Court(Mordecai, Adam)
July 2, 2020 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Securitas Security Services USA Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by July 14, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 7/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
July 2, 2020 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Securitas Security Services USA Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Crescent Plowing Services, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by July 14, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 7/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (mc)
July 2, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-737-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Securitas Security Services USA Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mordecai, Adam)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2019-CV-01826 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1998928) filed by Securitas Security Services USA Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 7/23/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mordecai, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA Inc.
Represented By: Adam R. Mordecai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindt & Sprungli (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crescent Plowing Services, LLC
Represented By: Naomi L. Getman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Blair
Represented By: Ryan Lansing Russman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?